Corporations and Associations (C1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0372 / CH0453
    (SB0202 / CH0452)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - ExemptionDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0702 / CH0068
    (SB0622 / CH0067)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0881Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company RepresentativeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0882
    (SB0578)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1021
    (SB0910)
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - RepealDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1140 / CH0528
    (SB0697 / CH0527)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1246
    (SB0469)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1278Corporations and Associations - "Crowdfunding" Laws - Restrictions and ComplianceDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0136Solar Energy Grant Program - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners AssociationsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
1/30/2013 - 2:45 p.m.
SB0202 / CH0452
    (HB0372 / CH0453)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - ExemptionSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0469
    (HB1246)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0578
    (HB0882)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0622 / CH0067
    (HB0702 / CH0068)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0697 / CH0527
    (HB1140 / CH0528)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0772Campaign Finance - Corporate Contributions and Independent Expenditures - Determination of Stockholder PreferenceSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0910
    (HB1021)
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - RepealSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.