Corporations and Associations (C1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0268Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company RepresentativeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0840
    (SB0347)
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - RepealDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0916 / CH0551
    (SB0713 / CH0550)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1243 / CH0558
    (SB0811 / CH0557)
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing ExemptionsDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1298
    (SB0395)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1308Limited Liability Companies - Fees - Young Adult-Owned BusinessesDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1328
    (SB0865 / CH0567)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsDelegate SwainIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1365Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding ActDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing cancelledRules and Executive Nominations
HJ0005Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football TeamDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0347
    (HB0840)
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - RepealSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0395
    (HB1298)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0713 / CH0550
    (HB0916 / CH0551)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0809Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0811 / CH0557
    (HB1243 / CH0558)
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing ExemptionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0840Corporations - Members of Boards of Directors - Demographic Information - Report to Board of Public WorksSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0865 / CH0567
    (HB1328)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0978Maryland Benefit Corporations - Purposes, Duties of Directors, and LiabilitySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.