Corporations and Associations (C1)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0351Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company RepresentativeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0521
    (SB0459)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From LiabilityDelegate KramerIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEconomic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0522 / CH0256
    (SB0681)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0576Maryland Local Stock Market and Social Stock Exchange Task ForceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0663
    (SB0179)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0741Maryland Cooperative Housing Corporation Act - Delinquency Period for Purpose of Eviction ActionDelegate HayesIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0885
    (SB0153)
Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder ApprovalDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0153
    (HB0885)
Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder ApprovalSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0179
    (HB0663)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0459
    (HB0521)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity from LiabilitySenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0670Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined ReportingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0681
    (HB0522 / CH0256)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0908Maryland Benefit Corporations - Purposes, Duties of Directors, and LiabilitySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.