Insurance - Health (C3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0185
    (SB0843)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013Delegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
HB0289Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians - Participation in a Consumer Operated and Oriented Plan (CO-OP) NetworkDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0360 / CH0106Health Insurance - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of LawChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0361 / CH0368Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0391
    (SB0224 / CH0208)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness ProgramDelegate KrebsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0736
    (SB0928)
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Referred to interim study by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0808
    (SB0680)
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation ClaimsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0908Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Prescription Drugs - Maximum Allowable Cost PricesDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0955 / CH0394
    (SB0888)
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1001
    (SB0585)
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on ComplianceDelegate HammenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1015
    (SB0746)
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First ProtocolDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1160 / CH0576
    (SB0904 / CH0575)
Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider ContractsDelegate KachApproved by the Governor - Chapter 576Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1216 / CH0289
    (SB0581 / CH0288)
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization FormsDelegate Kelly, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1252 / CH0291
    (SB0582 / CH0290)
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Utilization Review Criteria and StandardsDelegate Kelly, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0224 / CH0208
    (HB0391)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Finance
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0581 / CH0288
    (HB1216 / CH0289)
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization FormsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0582 / CH0290
    (HB1252 / CH0291)
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Utilization Review Criteria and StandardsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0585
    (HB1001)
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on ComplianceSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0680
    (HB0808)
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation ClaimsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0746
    (HB1015)
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First ProtocolSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0769 / CH0318Health Benefit Plans - Proposed Rate Increases - Notice to InsuredsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 318Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0843
    (HB0185)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0888
    (HB0955 / CH0394)
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator GaragiolaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0904 / CH0575
    (HB1160 / CH0576)
Health Insurance - Vision Services - Provider ContractsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 575Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0928
    (HB0736)
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.