Insurance - Health (C3)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0230 / CH0079
    (SB0092)
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Health and Government Operations
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0534Health Insurance - Coverage of Brand Name Prescription Drugs for Mental Health TreatmentDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0552 / CH0494
    (SB0703)
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small EmployersDelegate PendergrassEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0562 / CH0434
    (SB0869)
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 434Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0565 / CH0096
    (SB0461)
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Disability InsuranceDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0660
    (SB0450 / CH0035)
Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for SubmissionDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0759 / CH0274Health Insurance - Small Employer Health Benefit Plan Premium Subsidy Program - RepealDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0770
    (SB0573 / CH0367)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0781
    (SB0241 / CH0023)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - RequiredDelegate WaldstreicherVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0838 / CH0483
    (SB0416 / CH0482)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility ServicesDelegate HillEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0859 / CH0108
    (SB0437)
Nonprofit Health Service Plans - Hearing and Order - Impact of Law or Regulatory Action by Another StateDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0887
    (SB0606 / CH0372)
Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - CoverageDelegate Young, K.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0949
    (SB0471)
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured MarylandersDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0990
    (SB0834)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - StandardsDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1010
    (SB0586)
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on ComplianceDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1140
    (SB0871)
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating PharmaciesDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1157
    (SB0803)
Health Insurance - Nonpreferred Providers - Assignment of Benefits, Reimbursement, and Fraudulent Insurance ActsDelegate KrebsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1190
    (SB0811)
Health Insurance and Discount Medical Plans - Vision Care Services and MaterialsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0092
    (HB0230 / CH0079)
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Termination DateSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0119Health Maintenance Organizations - Premium Tax and Transfer of Premium Tax Exemption Value - RepealSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0241 / CH0023
    (HB0781)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - RequiredSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 23Finance
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0416 / CH0482
    (HB0838 / CH0483)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility ServicesSenator KaganEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0437
    (HB0859 / CH0108)
Nonprofit Health Service Plans - Hearing and Order - Impact of Law or Regulatory Action by Another StateSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0450 / CH0035
    (HB0660)
Health Insurance - Expense Reimbursement Claims Forms - Methods for SubmissionSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0461
    (HB0565 / CH0096)
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Disability InsuranceSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0471
    (HB0949)
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured MarylandersSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0556 / CH0363Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal LawChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0573 / CH0367
    (HB0770)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0586
    (HB1010)
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on ComplianceSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0606 / CH0372
    (HB0887)
Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - CoverageSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 372Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0703
    (HB0552 / CH0494)
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small EmployersSenator MiddletonIn the House - Rereferred to Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0803
    (HB1157)
Health Insurance - Nonpreferred Providers - Assignment of Benefits, Reimbursement, and Fraudulent Insurance ActsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0811
    (HB1190)
Health Insurance and Discount Medical Plans - Vision Care Services and MaterialsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0834
    (HB0990)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - StandardsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0869
    (HB0562 / CH0434)
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination DateSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0871
    (HB1140)
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating PharmaciesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.