Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0071Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic AreaDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0114Task Force to Study Recovery Efforts Following Residential FiresDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0342 / CH0270
    (SB0446 / CH0269)
Homeowner's or Renter's Insurance and Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Bundling Requirement - ProhibitedDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 270Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0392 / CH0111Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium IncreaseChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0431 / CH0115Insurance - Maryland Insurance Acquisitions Disclosure and Control Act - RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0537 / CH0377Insurance Producers - Continuing Education - Online CoursesDelegate SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 377Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0695 / CH0383Homeowner's Insurance - Anti-Concurrent Causation Clause - Notice and StudyDelegate RudolphApproved by the Governor - Chapter 383Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0724 / CH0385Insurance - Risk Based Capital Standards - Fraternal Benefit Societies and Life InsurersChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 385Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0763
    (SB0736 / CH0311)
Insurance - Fraudulent Insurance Acts - Compensation for DeductibleSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0764
    (SB0803)
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - LimitationDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0954
    (SB0763)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - RequiredDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1011
    (SB0682 / CH0525)
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Employees of Vendor, Disclosures to Customers, and StudyDelegate JamesonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB1089
    (SB0919)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Required SecurityDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1117Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital BenefitsDelegate DonoghueIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1132 / CH0074
    (SB0749 / CH0073)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational ChangesDelegate RudolphApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1135
    (SB0687)
Limited Lines - Travel InsuranceDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1166
    (SB0777 / CH0321)
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and ReinsuranceDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1203 / CH0406Homeowner's or Renter's Insurance - Policy Exclusions for Specific Breeds or Mixed Breeds of Dogs - NoticesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 406Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1205 / CH0407Study of Captive InsurersDelegate RudolphApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1375Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor VehiclesDelegate FisherIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic Matters
HB1438
    (SB0962)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate RegulationDelegate JamesonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1519
    (SB0735)
Insurance - Premium FinancingDelegate DonoghueIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0296Homeowner's and Renter's Insurance - Coverage for Dog OwnersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0446 / CH0269
    (HB0342 / CH0270)
Homeowner's or Renter's Insurance and Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Bundling Requirement - ProhibitedSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 269Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0568Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Motorist Benefits - Procedural Requirements for Filing ClaimsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0577Public Safety - Firearms - Liability Insurance RequirementSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledJudicial Proceedings
SB0682 / CH0525
    (HB1011)
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Employees of Vendor, Disclosures to Customers, and StudySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0687
    (HB1135)
Limited Lines - Travel InsuranceSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0735
    (HB1519)
Insurance - Premium FinancingSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0736 / CH0311
    (HB0763)
Insurance - Fraudulent Insurance Acts - Compensation for DeductibleSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0749 / CH0073
    (HB1132 / CH0074)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational ChangesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 73Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0763
    (HB0954)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - RequiredSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0777 / CH0321
    (HB1166)
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and ReinsuranceSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 321Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0780Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage AgentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0803
    (HB0764)
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - LimitationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0919
    (HB1089)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of IndemnificationSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by FinanceFinance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0930 / CH0334Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Payments - Acceptance on Installment Payment Basis and Premium Finance AgreementsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0950Personal Automobile Insurance - Rescission of Policy or Binder - Misrepresentations by ApplicantSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0962
    (HB1438)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate RegulationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.