Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 44

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0107Medical Professional Liability Insurance for Nonprofit Health Care Providers MC 4-15Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0352Life Insurance - Freedom to Travel ActDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0358 / CH0088
    (SB0368)
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Cancellation and Nonrenewal - NoticeDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0440 / CH0248Howard County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements Ho. Co. 8-15Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 248Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0468
    (SB0465 / CH0036)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance CompanyDelegate JamesonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0565 / CH0096
    (SB0461)
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Disability InsuranceDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0647Joint Insurance Association - Private Insurers - NoticeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0684Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - DeductiblesDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0685
    (SB0435)
Homeowner's Insurance - Coverage for Loss Caused by Water DamageDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0691Homeowner's Insurance - Notices to Policyholders - RequiredDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0697Life Insurers - Reserve Investments - Loans Secured by Real EstateDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0699
    (SB0434)
Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium IncreaseDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0700
    (SB0436)
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - ExemptionsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0724
    (SB0569)
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of CoverageDelegate ValderramaIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0732
    (SB0770 / CH0051)
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell InsuranceDelegate VaughnVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0770
    (SB0573 / CH0367)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0890State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - RequiredDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0972Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and CoverageDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0974Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Daylight Driving Discount for SeniorsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1012Homeowner's Insurance and Renter's Insurance - Adjustment and Settlement PracticesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1050Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Installment AgreementsDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB1093
    (SB0614)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1253
    (SB0910 / CH0208)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - StudyDelegate JamesonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0142 / CH0016Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Finance Companies - Assignment of Rights and Obligations - Repeal of Termination DateSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 16Finance
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0145 / CH0325Civil Actions - Disclosure of Information - Repeal of Certification RequirementSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 325Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0325 / CH0025Life Insurers - Reserve Investments - Loans Secured by Real EstateSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 25Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0368
    (HB0358 / CH0088)
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Cancellation and Nonrenewal - NoticeSenator KelleyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0434
    (HB0699)
Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium IncreaseSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0435
    (HB0685)
Homeowner's Insurance - Coverage for Loss Caused by Water DamageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0436
    (HB0700)
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - ExemptionsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0457Liability Insurance - Reservation of Rights for Failure to Cooperate - ProhibitionSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0461
    (HB0565 / CH0096)
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Disability InsuranceSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0465 / CH0036
    (HB0468)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance CompanySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0552Life Insurance - Payment of Death Benefits Under Group PoliciesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0553 / CH0039Motor Clubs - Scope of Law - FeesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0554 / CH0362Insurance - Reinsurers - FeesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0555 / CH0040Life Insurance - Cash Surrender Values - Supplemental BenefitsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0569
    (HB0724)
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of CoverageSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0573 / CH0367
    (HB0770)
Insurance - Standard Valuation Law and Reserve and Nonforfeiture RequirementsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Finance
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0608Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices, Policies, and Proof of Insurance - Electronic FormatChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0614
    (HB1093)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0749Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - ProhibitionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0770 / CH0051
    (HB0732)
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell InsuranceSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0910 / CH0208
    (HB1253)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - StudySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.