Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0027 / CH0430
    (SB0168 / CH0431)
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and ProceduresDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Health and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0059Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates - LimitationDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0189Insurance - Slavery Era Insurance Policy Reporting - RepealDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0473Baltimore City - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notice and Use of Consumer ReportDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0656
    (SB0945)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Occupation or Education LevelDelegate SydnorIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0657
    (SB1059)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or GenderDelegate SydnorIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0945Long–Term Care Insurance – Premium Rate Increases – Restriction (Equity in Long–Term Care Insurance Premiums Act)Delegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0946 / CH0508Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon LapseDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 508Health and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0979 / CH0197Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - RegulationDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0983Long-Term Care Insurance - Limitation on Renewal Premium Rate IncreasesDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1045
    (SB0743 / CH0852)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Peer–to–Peer Car SharingDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1078 / CH0513
    (SB0792)
Commercial Insurance - Insurance Producers - CommissionsDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 513Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1083 / CH0485
    (SB0673 / CH0486)
Insurance – Contracts and Policies – Educational and Promotional Materials and Articles of MerchandiseDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1127 / CH0193
    (SB0876 / CH0194)
Insurance – Commercial Lines – Exemptions From FilingsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1161 / CH0195
    (SB0856 / CH0196)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsDelegate BrooksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1179
    (SB0880)
Commercial Insurance - Certificates of Insurance - FeeDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1193Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and EffectsDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1514Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Low-Cost Automobile Insurance ProgramDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1670
    (SB0072)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating PoliciesDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1748Homeowner’s Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Status as Surviving SpouseDelegate SydnorIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1784Life Insurance - Sale by TelephoneDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0057 / CH0666Insurance - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Technical CorrectionChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 666Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0059 / CH0042Insurance - Antifraud Plan Requirement - ApplicationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0071 / CH0043Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and RevocationsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0072
    (HB1670)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating PoliciesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:15 p.m.Finance
1/23/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
SB0078 / CH0667Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 667Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0168 / CH0431
    (HB0027 / CH0430)
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and ProceduresSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0206Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates and BenefitsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0453 / CH0192Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - ConsistencySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 192Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0652 / CH0198Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - RegulationSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 198Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0673 / CH0486
    (HB1083 / CH0485)
Insurance - Contracts and Policies - Educational and Promotional Materials and Articles of MerchandiseSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0743 / CH0852
    (HB1045)
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing ProgramsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0792
    (HB1078 / CH0513)
Commercial Insurance – Insurance Producers – CommissionsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0856 / CH0196
    (HB1161 / CH0195)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0876 / CH0194
    (HB1127 / CH0193)
Insurance - Commercial Lines - Exemptions From FilingsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0880
    (HB1179)
Commercial Insurance – Certificates of Insurance – FeeSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0945
    (HB0656)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education LevelSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1059
    (HB0657)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or GenderSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1131 / CH0624Motor Vehicle Insurance - Commercial Policies - Insurance Identification CardSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:04 P.M.