Utility Regulation (C5)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 45

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0035 / CH0217
    (SB0011)
Public Service Commission - Hearing Examiners - Change of Job TitleDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Economic Matters
1/29/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0140 / CH0223
    (SB0054)
Public Service Commission - Restrictions After ServiceDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Economic Matters
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0341
    (SB0401 / CH0029)
Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable WiresDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0376Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Local Law, Rule, or RegulationDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0377
    (SB0373)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015)Delegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0378Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying BiomassDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0453Public Utilities - Telephone Service - Battery for Backup PowerDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0469
    (SB0460 / CH0174)
Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission LinesDelegate JamesonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0472 / CH0250
    (SB0207)
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory RequirementsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB0508Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and InstallationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0516
    (SB0009)
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0537
    (SB0112)
Public Service Commission - Taxicab Services - Contract With Baltimore City Board of School CommissionersDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0541 / CH0431Public Service Commission - Attachments to Utility Poles - StudyDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0611
    (SB0747)
Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation ManagementDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0636
    (SB0154)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0656Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act)Delegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0893Electric Companies - Customers - Security DepositsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0933Energy Efficiency and Demand Management Programs and Services - RepealDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0972Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and CoverageDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1067Public Service Commission - Membership - Selection and TermDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1087 / CH0347
    (SB0481)
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System ProgramDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1138Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required CrewDelegate McCrayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1166
    (SB0577)
Public Utilities - Telecommunications Law - ModernizationDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1231
    (SB0868 / CH0204)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network ServicesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 a.m.
SB0009
    (HB0516)
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0011
    (HB0035 / CH0217)
Public Service Commission - Hearing Examiners - Change of Job TitleSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
1/22/2015 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0054
    (HB0140 / CH0223)
Public Service Commission - Restrictions After ServiceSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0112
    (HB0537)
Public Service Commission - Taxicab Services - Contract With Baltimore City Board of School CommissionersSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0154
    (HB0636)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0207
    (HB0472 / CH0250)
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory RequirementsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0353 / CH0161Electric Companies - Installation of Solar Electric Generating Facility - New Interconnection AgreementSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 161Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0373
    (HB0377)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015)Senator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0382Electric Companies - Customer Choice of Electricity Supplier - Smart MetersSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0398 / CH0346Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0401 / CH0029
    (HB0341)
Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable WiresSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 29Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0460 / CH0174
    (HB0469)
Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission LinesSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0481
    (HB1087 / CH0347)
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System ProgramSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0577
    (HB1166)
Public Utilities - Telecommunications Law - ModernizationSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0747
    (HB0611)
Public Utilities - Electric Companies - Vegetation ManagementSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0760Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Combustion SourceSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0826Energy Efficiency Programs - Transferring Development to the Maryland Energy AdministrationSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0868 / CH0204
    (HB1231)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire TransportationSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0899Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and ApprovalSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0914Electric Companies - Definition by ClassSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0938Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent CountySenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.