Horse Racing (C6)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0704Off-Track Betting - Maryland State Fairgrounds - ProhibitionDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0707 / CH0195
    (SB0372 / CH0194)
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and RestitutionDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0727 / CH0496Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Public Hearing RequirementsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0815 / CH0497
    (SB1116)
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing AuthorizationCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0965 / CH0727The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016Delegate WalkerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0372 / CH0194
    (HB0707 / CH0195)
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and RestitutionSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1116
    (HB0815 / CH0497)
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing AuthorizationSenator NormanIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.