Horse Racing (C6)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0130
    (SB0032)
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race CourseDelegate BeidleIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0392 / CH0333
    (SB0381 / CH0334)
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss AssistanceDelegate TurnerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0421
    (SB0463)
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and CostsDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0489Study Group on Building a Supertrack and Performance Center in Baltimore CountyDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1177
    (SB1115)
Horse Racing – Interstate Compact on Anti–Doping and Drug Testing StandardsDelegate KaiserIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB1442Horse Racing License – Land Preservation Trust – Shawan DownsDelegate LongIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB1592 / CH0221
    (SB0851 / CH0222)
Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. - Designation as Employer and MembershipDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Economic Matters
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1721 / CH0184
    (SB1158 / CH0185)
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - ModificationsDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 184Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0032
    (HB0130)
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race CourseSenator DeGrangeIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0381 / CH0334
    (HB0392 / CH0333)
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss AssistanceSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0463
    (HB0421)
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and CostsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing canceledFinance
SB0762Horse Racing License - Land Preservation Trust - Shawan DownsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0851 / CH0222
    (HB1592 / CH0221)
Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and MembershipSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1115
    (HB1177)
Horse Racing - Interstate Compact on Anti-Doping and Drug Testing StandardsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1158 / CH0185
    (HB1721 / CH0184)
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - ModificationsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 185Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

April 24, 2018 2:58 P.M.