Gaming (C7)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0030Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Repeal of Constitutional Amendment - Changes to Statutory ProvisionsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0069 / CH0007
    (SB0006 / CH0006)
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - RepealDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0138Video Lottery Proceeds - Education Trust Fund - Security and Mental Health Services at Public SchoolsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0175
    (SB0314)
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0204
    (SB0106)
Baltimore City - Charitable Gaming Events - For-Profit and Nonprofit OrganizationsDelegate StukesIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0253
    (SB0535 / CH0495)
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip JarsWashington County DelegationIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedWays and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0310
    (SB0430)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0344
    (SB0130)
Harford County - Charitable GamingDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0414 / CH0228
    (SB0315 / CH0227)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0446Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall AirportDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0454Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 8-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0486Criminal Law - Gaming - Home GamesDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0538Video Lottery Facility - Credit Extensions to Patrons - LimitationDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0567Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed EstablishmentsDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0579Veterans' Organizations - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Use of ProceedsDelegate ElliottIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0646 / CH0629
    (SB0918)
Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations MC 5-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0662Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on PayoutsDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0673Prince George's County - Video Lottery Operation License - Awarded to Highest BidderDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0752 / CH0137Video Lottery Gaming - Term of LicenseChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0840Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight - MembershipDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1020 / CH0143Baltimore City - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact GrantsDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1053 / CH0041
    (SB0282 / CH0040)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1059 / CH0662Baltimore City - Video Lottery Operation Licensee - Employee Data CollectionDelegate HaynesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 662Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1083Prince George's County - Gaming - Charity Chips PG 312-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1143Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation CommissionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB1155 / CH0578Video Lottery Facilities - Table Game ProceedsDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 578Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0006 / CH0006
    (HB0069 / CH0007)
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - RepealSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0036Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0106
    (HB0204)
Baltimore City - Charitable Gaming Events - For-Profit and Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0130
    (HB0344)
Harford County - Charitable GamingSenator GlassmanIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0272State Lottery Agency - Tickets - Electronic Devices Connected to the InternetSenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0282 / CH0040
    (HB1053 / CH0041)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0314
    (HB0175)
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0315 / CH0227
    (HB0414 / CH0228)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0430
    (HB0310)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0535 / CH0495
    (HB0253)
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip JarsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0905 / CH0577Video Lottery Facilities - Table Game ProceedsSenator DeGrangeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 577Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0917 / CH0580Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 580Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0918
    (HB0646 / CH0629)
Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' OrganizationsSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.