Gaming (C7)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0158
    (SB0037)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0305
    (SB0428)
Criminal Law - Gaming - Home GamesDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0329 / CH0097
    (SB0615)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 97Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0367
    (SB0441 / CH0060)
Worcester County - Bingo Board - RepealWorcester County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0372Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed EstablishmentsDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0454 / CH0230Gaming - Emergency Suspension of LicenseChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 230Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0460 / CH0231Gaming - Background InvestigationsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0465State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - AuthorizedChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0535Veterans' Organizations - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Use of ProceedsDelegate ElliottIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0748Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Mandatory AuditDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0817Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall AirportDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0837Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grant DistributionDelegate Turner, V.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0902Slot Machines - Ownership and Operation by War Veterans' Organizations - Allocation of ProceedsDelegate BotelerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0907 / CH0622Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Child Support PaymentsDelegate OlszewskiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0965Prince George's County - Raffles - Charitable Foundation Affiliated With Professional Football Team PG 303-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0978Prince George's County - Gaming - Charity Chips PG 307-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1092Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 03-14Howard County DelegationIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1136Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grants - Schedule and Reporting Requirements for Baltimore CityDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB1140Local Gaming - Charitable Casino EventsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1231Baltimore City - Charitable Gaming Events - Nonprofit OrganizationsDelegate StukesIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1362
    (SB0010)
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1452
    (SB1058)
Anne Arundel County - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - RegulationDelegate VitaleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1459Harford County - Gaming Events - LicenseHarford County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0010
    (HB1362)
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0037
    (HB0158)
Carroll County - GamingCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0107 / CH0130State Lottery - Retailer Licenses - Background InvestigationsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0195Harford County - Charitable GamingSenator GlassmanIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0374 / CH0293State Lottery - Task Force to Study Lottery RevenueSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0428
    (HB0305)
Criminal Law - Gaming - Home GamesSenator KingIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0441 / CH0060
    (HB0367)
Worcester County - Bingo Board - RepealSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0543Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grant DistributionSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
SB0615
    (HB0329 / CH0097)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsSenator BrinkleyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0828Baltimore County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1026Maryland State Fair - Funding ExtensionSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
SB1058
    (HB1452)
Anne Arundel County - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - RegulationSenator AstleIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.