Gaming (C7)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 42

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0032Amusement Devices - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Use by MinorsDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0085Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0090
    (SB0496)
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee PaymentsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0091
    (SB0495)
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of OwnershipChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0093
    (SB0497)
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal TermChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0300Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0350Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0377
    (SB0940)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
HB0545Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - BingoCarroll County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0645
    (SB0518)
Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of OperationFrederick County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0662Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair HillCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0811
    (SB0663)
Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation LicenseeDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0813
    (SB0438)
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - ProhibitionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0835State Lottery - Licensed Agents - CommissionsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0989Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and ImplementationDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0990Harford County - BingoHarford County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1138
    (SB1152)
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Distribution and Recreational FacilitiesDelegate AliIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1196Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted AreasDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB1227The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017Delegate MosbyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1230Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal OrganizationsDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1371Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Voluntary ExclusionDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1517
    (SB0465)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansDelegate GlennIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1537
    (SB1125)
Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - ExpansionDelegate BromwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1563Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grant DistributionDelegate KnottsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0028State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery ServiceChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/12/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0118Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0227Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Confiscation of Fake IdentificationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0228Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0352Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding ExtensionCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0383Baltimore City - Commercial Bingo - PermitsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0438
    (HB0813)
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0465
    (HB1517)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansSenator KaganIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0495
    (HB0091)
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact GrantsChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0496
    (HB0090)
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee PaymentsChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0497
    (HB0093)
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council MembershipChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0518
    (HB0645)
Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of OperationSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0663
    (HB0811)
Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation LicenseeSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0777State Lottery - Licensed Agents - CommissionsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0940
    (HB0377)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB1006Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - AuthorizationSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1125
    (HB1537)
Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - ExpansionSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1152
    (HB1138)
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational FacilitiesSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

March 24, 2017 1:11 P.M.