Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0045
    (SB0069 / CH0124)
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - ExceptionChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0108
    (SB0032)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0120
    (SB0167)
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District CourtSpeakerIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and TaxationJudiciary
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Budget and Taxation
HB0439
    (SB0538)
Courts - Jury Service - ExcusalDelegate SummersIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0500Judgeships - District CourtChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0726Judges - Mandatory Retirement AgeDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0803
    (SB1005)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court CostsDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0845Courts Administration - Contracts for Stenography Services - Pro Bono RequirementDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1186Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by SummonsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2014 - 3:30 p.m.
HB1260
    (SB0644 / CH0069)
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open DataDelegate BarveVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1292
    (SB0824)
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective BargainingDelegate JonesIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1348State Government - Advertisements - Paid for by Maryland TaxpayersDelegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0032
    (HB0108)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0069 / CH0124
    (HB0045)
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - ExceptionChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0167
    (HB0120)
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District CourtPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0214Vehicle Laws - Fines for Texting Offenses - Use for Educational ProgramsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0538
    (HB0439)
Courts - Jury Service - ExcusalSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0644 / CH0069
    (HB1260)
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open DataSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0824
    (HB1292)
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1005
    (HB0803)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court CostsSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1038Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All CountiesSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.