Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0074 / CH0091
    (SB0117)
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District CourtSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBudget and Taxation
HB0199Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate CourtDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0223Circuit Court Judges - ElectionDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0224Circuit Court Judges - ElectionDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0237 / CH0531
    (SB0150 / CH0530)
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - RepealDelegate SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0388Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0448
    (SB0179)
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0475Courts - Grand Juries - Prohibited ActionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0481
    (SB0502)
Judges - Mandatory Retirement AgeDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0607Courts - Jurors - State Per Diem AmountDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0814
    (SB0849)
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health CourtsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0866
    (SB0833)
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic ViolenceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0876Public Safety - District Court Commissioner - Complaints of Police BrutalityDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1122Voting Disclosure Act of 2016Delegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1164Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial OfficeDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1638Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - FundingDelegate McKayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0082Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - RepealChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0117
    (HB0074 / CH0091)
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District CourtPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0150 / CH0530
    (HB0237 / CH0531)
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - RepealSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0179
    (HB0448)
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0502
    (HB0481)
Judges - Mandatory Retirement AgeSenator MillerIn the House - Second Reading PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0833
    (HB0866)
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic ViolenceSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0849
    (HB0814)
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health CourtsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1101Jurors - Qualification - Prior ConvictionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB1134Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Costs for Appointed Legal RepresentationSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1156Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public DefenderSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.