Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0014Circuit Courts - Fee for Special Admission of Out-of-State Attorney - Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0236 / CH0507
    (SB0794 / CH0508)
Legal Advice to Corporations - ClarificationDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 507Judiciary
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0280
    (SB0076)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of NameDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
HB0476
    (SB0746 / CH0834)
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous CountyChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0579Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0724Circuit Court Judges - ElectionDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0826Circuit Court Judges - Selection and TenureDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0969Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt BikeDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0972 / CH0798
    (SB0811 / CH0797)
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Repeal of SunsetDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 798Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1056Election Law - Court Offices - Nonpartisan ElectionsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1082 / CH0573
    (SB1060 / CH0574)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Delegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1191
    (SB0378)
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against RulingDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1202
    (SB1018)
Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Diversionary Docket and WorkgroupDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1291
    (SB0856 / CH0839)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsDelegate Barnes, B.In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1344
    (SB0182 / CH0010)
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - EligibilityDelegate Wilson, C.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1354
    (SB0842)
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017Delegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1379Courts - Criminal and Civil Immunity - Prescribing, Dispensing, and Administering Opioid AntagonistsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1382 / CH0439
    (SB1121 / CH0440)
Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary ElectionDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
HB1558Postconviction Relief - Ineffective Assistance by Counsel - Mandatory Referral to Attorney Grievance CommissionDelegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0076
    (HB0280)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Change of NameSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0182 / CH0010
    (HB1344)
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - EligibilitySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0378
    (HB1191)
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against RulingSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0744Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0746 / CH0834
    (HB0476)
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous CountyChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0794 / CH0508
    (HB0236 / CH0507)
Legal Advice to Corporations - ClarificationSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 508Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0811 / CH0797
    (HB0972 / CH0798)
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Repeal of SunsetSenator ZirkinEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 797Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0842
    (HB1354)
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0856 / CH0839
    (HB1291)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsSenator GuzzoneEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0864Education - Overdose on Public School Premises - Substance Abuse Treatment ProgramsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB1018
    (HB1202)
Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of WorkgroupSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1060 / CH0574
    (HB1082 / CH0573)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Senator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1121 / CH0440
    (HB1382 / CH0439)
Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary ElectionSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 440Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.