Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0559 / CH0048
    (SB0408 / CH0047)
Washington County - Special Deputy SheriffsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0910Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
HB0944District Court - Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant CasesDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB1022
    (SB0655)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual SalaryDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1349 / CH0152Prince George's County Sheriff - Compensation and Salaries PG 319-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1400Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryBaltimore County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1406 / CH0416
    (SB0003)
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increases Ho. Co. 13-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1407 / CH0153Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0003
    (HB1406 / CH0416)
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary IncreaseSenator RobeyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0408 / CH0047
    (HB0559 / CH0048)
Washington County - Special Deputy SheriffsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0637Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0655
    (HB1022)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0931 / CH0335Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalarySenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.