Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0181
    (SB0040 / CH0008)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0182
    (SB0557 / CH0064)
Carroll County - Sheriff - SalaryCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0211
    (SB0556 / CH0179)
Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0242
    (SB0282 / CH0152)
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent CountyDelegate JacobsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0390
    (SB0057 / CH0121)
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsDorchester County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0485
    (SB0617 / CH0184)
Frederick County - Sheriff - SalaryFrederick County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0825
    (SB0639)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney and Deputy, Assistant, and Temporary Assistant State's Attorneys - Annual Salary and CompensationAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0914 / CH0243Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 243Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0976 / CH0245Prince George's County - State's Attorney - Salary PG 310-14Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1089
    (SB0946)
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1112 / CH0357
    (SB0897 / CH0356)
Frederick County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 357Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1206 / CH0247
    (SB0967)
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and PensionDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1381 / CH0108Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary IncreasesAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1436Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan ParticipationCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1493 / CH0253
    (SB1074)
Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on DutyAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1552 / CH0110Wicomico County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalariesWicomico County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 110Judiciary
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0040 / CH0008
    (HB0181)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0057 / CH0121
    (HB0390)
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 121Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0282 / CH0152
    (HB0242)
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent CountySenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0475Harford County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator JacobsIn the House - First Reading Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
SB0556 / CH0179
    (HB0211)
Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 179Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0557 / CH0064
    (HB0182)
Carroll County - Sheriff - SalaryCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 64Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0612 / CH0310Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan ParticipationCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0617 / CH0184
    (HB0485)
Frederick County - Sheriff - SalarySenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 184Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0639
    (HB0825)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary and CompensationAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0897 / CH0356
    (HB1112 / CH0357)
Frederick County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalarySenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0936 / CH0206Cecil County - Sheriff and Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0946
    (HB1089)
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and PensionSenator AstleIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
SB0967
    (HB1206 / CH0247)
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary and PensionSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0997Baltimore City Sheriff's Office - Deputy Sheriff Majors - Number of AppointmentsSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1074
    (HB1493 / CH0253)
Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on DutySenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.