Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0542 / CH0479
    (SB0264 / CH0478)
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of CounselDelegate O'DonnellEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0981 / CH0292Cecil County - Orphans' Court - SessionsCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Health and Government Operations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0993
    (SB0752)
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining DisputesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB1204Anne Arundel County - Assistant to the Sheriff - AppointmentDelegate SophocleusIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0264 / CH0478
    (HB0542 / CH0479)
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of CounselSenator MillerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0752
    (HB0993)
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining DisputesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.