Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0148 / CH0166
    (SB0134 / CH0165)
Somerset County - Sheriff - SalaryDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 166Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0152
    (SB0136)
Somerset County - State's Attorney - SalaryDelegate OttoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0447 / CH0621Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit CourtCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0505 / CH0670
    (SB0390 / CH0669)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0816 / CH0632Cecil County - Sheriff - SalaryCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1157 / CH0302Calvert County - Assistant Sheriff - Salary and StatusCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1556
    (SB1128 / CH0712)
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective BargainingDelegate FoldenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Rules
SB0134 / CH0165
    (HB0148 / CH0166)
Somerset County - Sheriff - SalarySenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165Judicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0136
    (HB0152)
Somerset County - State's Attorney - SalarySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0146 / CH0052Harford County - State's Attorney - SalaryHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Judicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0390 / CH0669
    (HB0505 / CH0670)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB1106 / CH0467Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 467Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1128 / CH0712
    (HB1556)
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective BargainingSenator YoungEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712Finance
3/18/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.