Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0357Expungement - Fee - Baltimore City Consent DecreeDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0439
    (SB0246)
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Annual SalaryDelegate OttoIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0573
    (SB0456 / CH0437)
Carroll County - State's Attorney - SalaryCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0574
    (SB0457 / CH0436)
Carroll County - Sheriff's SalaryCarroll County DelegationIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0629 / CH0079
    (SB0211 / CH0078)
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense AllowanceCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0670Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0671
    (SB0544)
Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - PositionsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0700
    (SB0738)
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0858
    (SB0639 / CH0471)
Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and DutiesAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0903
    (SB0705)
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional RightDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0982Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Separation Requirement - ExemptionDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1179
    (SB1136)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual SalaryDelegate SophocleusIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB1182 / CH0495
    (SB0827)
Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual SalaryFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1191
    (SB0378)
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against RulingDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1318Baltimore City - Nonviolent Offenders - Release Without BailDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1403
    (SB0409)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsBaltimore City DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1431Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingHarford County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-0)Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1500Sheriff of Harford County - SalaryHarford County DelegationIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1575Prince George's County - Duties of Sheriff - Responding to Domestic Violence Calls PG xx-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0077 / CH0196Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0211 / CH0078
    (HB0629 / CH0079)
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense AllowanceCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0246
    (HB0439)
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0378
    (HB1191)
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against RulingSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0409
    (HB1403)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsBaltimore City SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0456 / CH0437
    (HB0573)
Carroll County - State's Attorney - SalaryCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0457 / CH0436
    (HB0574)
Carroll County - Sheriff's SalaryCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 436Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0509 / CH0454Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalarySenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0639 / CH0471
    (HB0858)
Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and DutiesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0705
    (HB0903)
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional RightSenator MuseIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0738
    (HB0700)
St. Mary's County - Circuit Court Personnel - RepealSenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0827
    (HB1182 / CH0495)
Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator HoughIn the House - Second Reading PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1136
    (HB1179)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator OaksIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:51 P.M.