Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0015Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Organization and NegotiationDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0083
    (SB0073 / CH0647)
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0256Prince George's County - Landlord-Tenant Cases - Alternative Dispute Resolution Program PG 409-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0284 / CH0607
    (SB0636)
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective BargainingCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 607Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0498 / CH0112Calvert County - Salary of Assistant SheriffCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0554 / CH0820
    (SB0436 / CH0821)
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ SalariesCaroline County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0631 / CH0540Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - DistributionDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0720 / CH0167
    (SB0486 / CH0168)
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension FormulaAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 167Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0809 / CH0829Howard County - Sheriff's Salary Ho. Co. 8-18Howard County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1169
    (SB0343)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1247 / CH0838Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – CompensationAnne Arundel County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1357 / CH0841Calvert County - County Officials - SalariesCalvert County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0073 / CH0647
    (HB0083)
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective BargainingHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0343
    (HB1169)
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal InvestigatorsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0436 / CH0821
    (HB0554 / CH0820)
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ SalariesCaroline County SenatorsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0486 / CH0168
    (HB0720 / CH0167)
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension FormulaSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
SB0636
    (HB0284 / CH0607)
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective BargainingCecil County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0825Baltimore City - Sheriff's Office - Appointments, Salaries, and Workers' CompensationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB1259 / CH0370Harford County District Courthouse – H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial PlazaSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.