Human Relations (D5)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0804 / CH0548
    (SB0784 / CH0547)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancyDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1334Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and ChildbirthDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
Appropriations
HB1527Anne Arundel County - Human Relations - Violations of County Discrimination LawsDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0449Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0487
    (HB0603)
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0784 / CH0547
    (HB0804 / CH0548)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancySenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.