Human Relations (D5)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0037Employment Discrimination - Dress and Grooming StandardsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0366Home Act of 2014Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0381
    (SB0237)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for InternsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0391Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Employees Inquiring About, Discussing, or Disclosing WagesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0935
    (SB0505)
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term SupportsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1098Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1265
    (SB0212 / CH0474)
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014Delegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1350
    (SB0688)
Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2014Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0212 / CH0474
    (HB1265)
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014Senator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0237
    (HB0381)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for InternsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0505
    (HB0935)
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term SupportsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0688
    (HB1350)
Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2014Senator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.