Human Relations (D5)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0106Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society StatusDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0759Home Act of 2016Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1269
    (SB0223)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1478Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of EmployerDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0024Discrimination in Housing - Military StatusSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0223
    (HB1269)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0869Governor's Office of Minority Affairs - Workgroup on Reconciliation and EquitySenator Nathan-PulliamIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0948Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.