Human Relations (D5)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0172
    (SB0728)
Home Act of 2017Delegate LaffertyIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0214Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0254State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without RequestDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0696
    (SB0849)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionDelegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1175
    (SB0834)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1519
    (SB0471)
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquityDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1551 / CH0456Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1613
    (SB0876)
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1659Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of EmployerDelegate SimonaireIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1661
    (SB1191 / CH0732)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0005Extension of Statutes of Limitations Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964Delegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0471
    (HB1519)
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquitySenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0728
    (HB0172)
Home Act of 2017Senator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0834
    (HB1175)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0849
    (HB0696)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0876
    (HB1613)
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)Senator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB1191 / CH0732
    (HB1661)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:51 A.M.