Human Relations (D5)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0246
    (SB0671)
Hate Crimes - Threats and PenaltiesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0257Department of Aging - Contract ReviewDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0935
    (SB0823)
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil PenaltiesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1109State Government - Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1342 / CH0525
    (SB1138)
State Government – Discrimination and HarassmentDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Rules
3/30/2018 - 12:30 p.m.
HB1565
    (SB1060)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionDelegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0350 / CH0417Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquitySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
SB0621 / CH0636Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National OriginSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0671
    (HB0246)
Hate Crimes - Threats and PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0823
    (HB0935)
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil PenaltiesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1060
    (HB1565)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1138
    (HB1342 / CH0525)
Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual HarassmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:01 P.M.