Juvenile Law (E3)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0079 / CH0213
    (SB0068)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 213Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0151 / CH0216Juvenile Services - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Reporting RequirementDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 216Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0222 / CH0218Education - Reportable Offenses - First Degree Burglary and Animal CrueltyDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 218Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0242
    (SB0282 / CH0152)
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent CountyDelegate JacobsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0407
    (SB0485)
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued DetentionDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0994Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
HB1035 / CH0439Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup - Membership and Duties PG 305-14Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1294
    (SB0757)
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1295
    (SB0515 / CH0178)
Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile CourtDelegate CarterVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB0068
    (HB0079 / CH0213)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0116 / CH0135Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination DateChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Judicial Proceedings
1/9/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0117Juvenile Law - Commitment - Placement VisitsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/9/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0118 / CH0033Juvenile Law - Juvenile Services Education - FacilitiesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0122 / CH0035Juvenile Law - Detention - Community Detention Violation HearingsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Judicial Proceedings
1/9/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0282 / CH0152
    (HB0242)
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent CountySenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0485
    (HB0407)
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued DetentionSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0515 / CH0178
    (HB1295)
Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile CourtSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0757
    (HB1294)
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1038Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All CountiesSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.