Juvenile Law (E3)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0471
    (SB0215)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0721 / CH0653
    (SB0674 / CH0654)
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for FemalesDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 653Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0853Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum AgeDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0893
    (SB0583)
Juvenile Law - ProbationDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0928
    (SB0907)
Juvenile Law - Procedure - Appearance by Video ConferenceDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1187
    (SB0784)
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget AppropriationDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1255
    (SB0981)
Juveniles - Mechanical RestraintsDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1256
    (SB0982 / CH0487)
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - ReportDelegate JalisiIn the House - Third Reading Passed (98-21)Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1569Prince George's County - Juvenile Offender in Need of Supervision Program - Study PG 304-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0005Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum AgeChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0035 / CH0194Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health ProgramChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0043 / CH0193Juvenile Court Records - DisclosureChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0215
    (HB0471)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0583
    (HB0893)
Juvenile Law - ProbationSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0674 / CH0654
    (HB0721 / CH0653)
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for FemalesSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0784
    (HB1187)
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget AppropriationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0904Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum AgeSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0907
    (HB0928)
Juvenile Law - Procedure - Appearance by Video ConferenceSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0981
    (HB1255)
Juveniles - Mechanical RestraintsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0982 / CH0487
    (HB1256)
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - ReportSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:32 A.M.