Juvenile Law (E3)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0319 / CH0706
    (SB0160 / CH0707)
Juvenile Law – TruancyDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 706Judiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0479
    (SB1066)
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health AssessmentDelegate MosbyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0555
    (SB0257)
Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as AdultsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0827
    (SB0669)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
HB1023 / CH0783
    (SB0861)
Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body AttachmentDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 783Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1508Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1524
    (SB1134)
Juvenile Justice Coordinating CouncilDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1550
    (SB0863)
Juvenile Law – Juvenile Court JurisdictionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1702
    (SB1147)
Juveniles - Reportable OffensesWashington County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0091 / CH0669Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court RecordsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 669Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0160 / CH0707
    (HB0319 / CH0706)
Juvenile Law – TruancySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 707Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0257
    (HB0555)
Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as AdultsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0669
    (HB0827)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0861
    (HB1023 / CH0783)
Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body AttachmentSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0863
    (HB1550)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Court JurisdictionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1066
    (HB0479)
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health AssessmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1134
    (HB1524)
Juvenile Justice Coordinating CouncilSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1147
    (HB1702)
Juveniles – Reportable OffensesWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:42 A.M.