Education - Local Bills (F3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0113
    (SB0173)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0194
    (SB0270)
Baltimore City - School Facilities - FundingDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0413
    (SB0010)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0507Baltimore County Public Schools - Enrollment and Transfer - Parental DecisionDelegate WeirIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0670 / CH0132Montgomery County - Board of Education Districts - Town of Kensington in One District MC 1-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 132Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0674 / CH0382Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 8-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0703Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0844
    (SB0694)
Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing EducationDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0891 / CH0265
    (SB0426 / CH0264)
Anne Arundel County - Drug Free School Zones - Hotline Number on SignsDelegate McConkeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 265Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0895 / CH0648Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 648Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0971
    (SB0107)
Anne Arundel County - School Board - MembershipDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1073 / CH0664Prince George's County Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum PG 419-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 664Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/8/2013 - 3:45 p.m.
HB1080Prince George's County Public Schools - Certificated Professional Individuals - Termination of Employment PG 417-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1107 / CH0147Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative PG 411-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1108Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Artificial Turf Fields PG 404-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1284Baltimore City Public Schools - Requirement to Demolish Closed SchoolsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB1285Prince George's County - Public School Construction Fee and Fund - Authority to Establish and Administer PG 402-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB1298Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - CompensationDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1309Prince George's County - Education - Consolidated and Coordinated Procurement PG 405-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB1362
    (SB0927)
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - RepealAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
HB1459Education - Cooperative or Joint Administration of ProgramsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0010
    (HB0413)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0107
    (HB0971)
Anne Arundel County - School Board - MembershipSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0108Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0173
    (HB0113)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0270
    (HB0194)
Baltimore City - School Facilities - FundingSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
SB0300Baltimore County - Board of Education - Prohibited MembersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0426 / CH0264
    (HB0891 / CH0265)
Anne Arundel County - Drug Free School Zones - Hotline Number on SignsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 264Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0694
    (HB0844)
Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing EducationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0927
    (HB1362)
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - RepealSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0993Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1005Baltimore County - Commission to Study the Establishment of a Truancy Reduction ProgramSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1071Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness InitiativePrince George's County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.