Education - Local Bills (F3)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0030Carroll County Board of Education - Budget - Public ReviewDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0035Baltimore City Public School System - Daily Attendance - RequirementsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0039Baltimore City Public Schools - Maintenance, Preservation, and Protection of Public Art - RequirementsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0052Baltimore City School Police Force - Vehicles and Firearms - ReportDelegate ConawayIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0054Baltimore City Public Schools - Health and Safety - Video CamerasDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0076 / CH0319Baltimore City Public Schools - Capital Project Scoring SystemDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 319Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0088Education - Selection of Members to the Baltimore County School BoardBaltimore County DelegationIn the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0102Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Ways and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0160
    (SB0131)
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0183Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)Baltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)Ways and Means
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0193Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and DrillsDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0360Baltimore City Public School System - Audit Exemption - ProhibitionDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0365Montgomery County - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Affirmative Consent MC 14-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0555Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0562
    (SB1012)
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Members - Appointment and RemovalDelegate HayesIn the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0621Cecil County Board of Education - Members - SalaryCecil County DelegationIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0685 / CH0329Baltimore City - Public Schools and City Council - Logistical and Financial AssistanceDelegate ConawayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0716 / CH0473
    (SB0899)
Anne Arundel County - Board of EducationAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0850Howard County - Board of Education Fund Transfers - Approval Process Ho. Co. 16-17Howard County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1028
    (SB0804)
Frederick County Board of Education - Student MemberDelegate Young, K.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1217
    (SB0956)
Dorchester County Board of Education - Nonprofessional Personnel Appointment - Advice and ConsentDorchester County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1299 / CH0308Howard County Board of Education - Elected School Board Ho. Co. 11-17Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1341Maryland Public School Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1449Baltimore City - Modifying or Closing Public School Facility - Review by Community Task ForceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1565Prince George's County Board of Education - Election of Vice Chair, Voting Procedures, and Final Report PG 402-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1571Prince George's County School System Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Task Force PG 416-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1576 / CH0311Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1622Prince George's County Board of Education - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative - Repeal PG 401-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1634Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Public School System - ReportsDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0131
    (HB0160)
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0582Baltimore County Public School System - Magnet Program - Selection of Students for Admission to Middle SchoolSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0804
    (HB1028)
Frederick County Board of Education - Student MemberSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0899
    (HB0716 / CH0473)
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0956
    (HB1217)
Dorchester County Board of Education - Nonprofessional Personnel Appointment - Advice and ConsentSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1012
    (HB0562)
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Members - Appointment and RemovalSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:45 P.M.