Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0552
    (SB0246 / CH0148)
Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police ForceDelegate SchuhVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0855
    (SB0038)
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of MembersCaroline County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0031Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One RequirementSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0038
    (HB0855)
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of MembersSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0246 / CH0148
    (HB0552)
Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police ForceAnne Arundel County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 148Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0463Community Colleges - Developmental Education Courses - Student Credit HoursSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.