Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0087
    (SB0714)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Student Loan DebtDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/23/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0138Video Lottery Proceeds - Education Trust Fund - Security and Mental Health Services at Public SchoolsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0475Public School Labor Relations - Renegotiation Procedures and Board AdministrationChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0530
    (SB0359)
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized RidersDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0685
    (SB0633 / CH0512)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareDelegate GriffithIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0844
    (SB0694)
Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing EducationDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0949
    (SB0936)
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support CenterDelegate BoboIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB1249Baltimore City - School Construction - Block GrantsDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1286
    (SB0691)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of ProofDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1342 / CH0678Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Governing Board and Data TransfersDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 678Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0058 / CH0439Adult Education and Literacy Services - High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility RequirementsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0359
    (HB0530)
Education - School Vehicle AttendantSenator PughIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-3)Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0433Task Force to Study the Establishment of Educational Programs for Adult LearnersSenator FergusonIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0633 / CH0512
    (HB0685)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0691
    (HB1286)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of ProofSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0694
    (HB0844)
Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing EducationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0714
    (HB0087)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Student Loan DebtSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
SB0743
    (HB0860 / CH0647)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Senator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and TaxationRules and Executive Nominations
SB0838Educational Institutions - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy ProtectionSenator YoungIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB0936
    (HB0949)
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support CenterSenator YoungIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SJ0001International Education - SupportSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.