Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0244
    (SB0776)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0264 / CH0321
    (SB0630 / CH0320)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Student Loan DebtDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 321Ways and Means
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
HB0427 / CH0403Education - Maryland Sudden Cardiac Arrest Awareness ActDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0440 / CH0268
    (SB0058 / CH0267)
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized RidersDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0459 / CH0099Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician AssistantsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0628 / CH0285
    (SB0238 / CH0284)
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality RequirementsDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
HB0653 / CH0606Education - Deaf Culture Digital LibraryDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 606Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0736
    (SB0251)
Public Schools and Institutions of Higher Education - Artificial Trans Fat - ProhibitionDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
HB0783
    (SB0717)
Task Force to Study School-Based Health CentersDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0884Income Tax Credit - Nonpublic Education ExpensesDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0885
    (SB0632)
Income Tax Credit - Student Loan PaymentsDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1063
    (SB0430 / CH0500)
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers and County Public Libraries - FundingDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedWays and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1110Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1154Public Schools - Parent Consent and Student PrivacyDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1198
    (SB0779)
Education - Children With Disabilities - Due Process HearingsDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB1242
    (SB0419 / CH0498)
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - FundingDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedWays and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1329
    (SB1029)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for SchoolsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1388 / CH0209
    (SB0988 / CH0208)
State Department of Education - Assessment Report for Broadband Capabilities in Public SchoolsDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 209Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1508
    (SB0833)
Educational Agencies and Institutions - Education Records - Disclosure of Personally Identifiable InformationDelegate AfzaliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1545 / CH0376
    (SB1104 / CH0375)
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center EmployeesDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 376Appropriations
3/13/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0030Educational Institutions - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy ProtectionSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0058 / CH0267
    (HB0440 / CH0268)
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized RidersSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0238 / CH0284
    (HB0628 / CH0285)
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality RequirementsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 284Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0251
    (HB0736)
Public Schools and Institutions of Higher Education - Artificial Trans Fat - ProhibitionSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0271Income Tax Credit - Home Instruction ExpensesSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
SB0355Task Force to Study the Establishment of Specialized and Accelerated Educational Programs for Adult LearnersSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0419 / CH0498
    (HB1242)
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - FundingSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 498Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0430 / CH0500
    (HB1063)
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers and County Public Libraries - FundingSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 500Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0630 / CH0320
    (HB0264 / CH0321)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Student Loan DebtSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0632
    (HB0885)
Income Tax Credit - Student Loan PaymentsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0717
    (HB0783)
Task Force to Study School-Based Health CentersSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0776
    (HB0244)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0779
    (HB1198)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of ProofSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0833
    (HB1508)
Educational Agencies and Institutions - Education Records - Disclosure of Personally Identifiable InformationSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0988 / CH0208
    (HB1388 / CH0209)
State Department of Education - Assessment Report for Broadband Capabilities in Public SchoolsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1029
    (HB1329)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for SchoolsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1104 / CH0375
    (HB1545 / CH0376)
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center EmployeesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.