Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0073
    (SB0210)
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From TollDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0138
    (SB0338)
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of MarylandDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0144
    (SB0337 / CH0549)
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - FundingDelegate HixsonIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0145Public School Labor Relations Board - Renegotiation Procedures and AdministrationDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0324Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test RequirementDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0335
    (SB0374 / CH0197)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - College Savings Plans - ContributionsDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0668 / CH0684
    (SB0584 / CH0683)
Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State FundingDelegate RosenbergEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0836Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to SafetyDelegate ArentzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1095
    (SB0369 / CH0067)
Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate PlattVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1213Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1375Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1410
    (SB0493 / CH0740)
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016Delegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB1456Public Schools - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1463
    (SB0317 / CH0063)
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - MembershipDelegate PattersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1488 / CH0654
    (SB0909)
Service, Stipends, and Scholarships - Maryland Corps Program - EstablishedDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsFinance
HB1503 / CH0141Adult Education - GED Testing Fees - Exemption for Homeless YouthDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0108 / CH0159Nurse Support Program Assistance Fund - RevisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0210
    (HB0073)
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From TollSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0317 / CH0063
    (HB1463)
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - MembershipSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0325Juvenile Services Education - ModificationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0337 / CH0549
    (HB0144)
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - FundingSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 549Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0338
    (HB0138)
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of MarylandSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0369 / CH0067
    (HB1095)
Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0374 / CH0197
    (HB0335)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - College Savings Plans - ContributionsSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0475Vehicle Laws - School Crossing Guards - Authority to Direct TrafficSenator RosapepeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0493 / CH0740
    (HB1410)
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016Senator PinskyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0584 / CH0683
    (HB0668 / CH0684)
Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State FundingSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB0646Income Tax Credit - Eligible Employers - Eligible InternshipsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0909
    (HB1488 / CH0654)
Service, Stipends, and Scholarships - Maryland Corps Program - EstablishedSenator FergusonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.