Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0136St. Mary's County - Board of Library TrusteesSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0228Child Care Centers - Definition of Child CareDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0281 / CH0358Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)Delegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0430 / CH0563
    (SB0379 / CH0564)
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding LevelsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0642Education - Dual Language Immersion Program - AuthorizationDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0644State Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Elementary and Secondary Education ExpensesDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0682
    (SB0438)
State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - EstablishedDelegate Barnes, D.In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0808Education – Collective Bargaining for Noncertificated Employees – Supervisory Employees and Management PersonnelDelegate TarlauVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0811 / CH0022
    (SB0819 / CH0029)
Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee ProcessingDelegate LuedtkeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB0814 / CH0207
    (SB0403 / CH0208)
Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning ExperiencesDelegate PattersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0823Education - Public School Teachers - PreparationDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0941 / CH0396Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – EligibilityDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1060County Boards of Education – Collection and Sharing of Student Data – PolicyDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1061
    (SB0775)
Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living SalariesDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1213Maryland 529 - Broker-Dealer College Investment Plan - Required EstablishmentDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB1220Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of NegotiationsDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB1226
    (SB0517)
Career Apprenticeship Investment ActDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB1341
    (SB0933 / CH0419)
College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – RevisionsDelegate JonesIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1358
    (SB0380)
Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible InternshipsDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1415 / CH0361
    (SB1092)
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBudget and Taxation
HB1599
    (SB0949)
Career Education Policy ActDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB1610State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and RenovationsDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1663Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Qualified Higher Education Expenses - Annual LimitationDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1711Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Higher Education Expenses and ABLE Account Contributions - Annual LimitationDelegate KipkeIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0237Adult Correctional Institutions – Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Pilot ProgramSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0379 / CH0564
    (HB0430 / CH0563)
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding LevelsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0380
    (HB1358)
Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible InternshipsSenator KingIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0403 / CH0208
    (HB0814 / CH0207)
Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning ExperiencesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0438
    (HB0682)
State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - EstablishedSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0517
    (HB1226)
Career Apprenticeship Investment ActSenator RosapepeIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0775
    (HB1061)
Education - Salaries of Noncertificated Public School Employees - Minimum Living SalariesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0819 / CH0029
    (HB0811 / CH0022)
Education – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative’s Access to New Employee ProcessingSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
SB0888Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of NegotiationsWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0933 / CH0419
    (HB1341)
College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – RevisionsSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0949
    (HB1599)
Career Education Policy ActSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB1092
    (HB1415 / CH0361)
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB1224Procurement - Prevailing Wage - ModificationsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.