Ethics (G2)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0141Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of LobbyistDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0142General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - ProhibitedDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0143Former Members of the General Assembly and Former Legislative Branch Officials - Employment RestrictionsDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0144Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former OfficialsDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0222General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial InterestsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0362 / CH0615Public Ethics - Definition of "Interest" - Mutual FundsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 615Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0432
    (SB0316)
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and EmployeesFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0867General Assembly - Use of Public Resources - Ballot IssuesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1023Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of MarylandDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1113Procurement - Disclosure Requirements and PenaltiesDelegate BohananIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1193Ethics - Lobbying Registration - State and Local Government Entities and AssociationsDelegate HuckerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1397
    (SB1065)
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and EnforcementDelegate BoboIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1429 / CH0418Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - EmploymentChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0316
    (HB0432)
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and EmployeesSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0665Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting RequirementsSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0695Public Ethics - General Assembly - Employment with Political Subdivisions and Public Institutions of Higher EducationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0869Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Meals, Receptions, and BeveragesSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
SB1065
    (HB1397)
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and EnforcementSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.