Ethics (G2)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0124General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial InterestsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0129 / CH0085
    (SB0407)
Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest ProvisionsDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0220
    (SB0480 / CH0062)
Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered LobbyistsDelegate JamesonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
HB0270 / CH0094General Provisions ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0872
    (SB0422)
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting RequirementsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1179Public Ethics - Former Members of the General Assembly, Legislative Branch Officials, and Executive Branch Officials - Lobbying RestrictionsDelegate BoboIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1250Ethics - Lobbying Regulation - Associations Representing Counties or Municipal CorporationsDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1369
    (SB0913)
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of Municipal Corporation - Confidential InformationDelegate GilchristIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0090 / CH0019Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Certification to Authorize Lobbying and Electronic Filing of RegistrationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 19Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0091 / CH0020State Ethics Commission - Local Governments and School Boards - Compliance EnforcementChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 20Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0092 / CH0021Public Ethics - Regulated Lobbyists - Ethics Training RequirementsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0109 / CH0032Public Ethics - Financial Disclosure Statements - Electronic FilingChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0129 / CH0037Public Ethics - Officials and Regulated Lobbyists - Late-Filing PenaltiesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0407
    (HB0129 / CH0085)
Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest ProvisionsSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0422
    (HB0872)
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting RequirementsSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0447Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Presumption of a Conflict - ClientsSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0480 / CH0062
    (HB0220)
Injured Workers' Insurance Fund Employees - Registration as Registered LobbyistsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic Matters
SB0913
    (HB1369)
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of Municipal Corporation - Confidential InformationSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1024Public Ethics Law - Prestige of Office - Prohibited UseSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.