Ethics (G2)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0130Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of Report (General Assembly Online Social Calendar)Delegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0200Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic MailDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0496 / CH0177
    (SB0194 / CH0176)
Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - DutiesDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 177Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0726Ethics - Reports of Regulated Lobbyists - Open Data FormatDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1164Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial OfficeDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0194 / CH0176
    (HB0496 / CH0177)
Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - DutiesSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0395 / CH0201Ethics - Local Government - Conflict of Interest and Financial DisclosureSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 201Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0807Higher Education - Ethics and Procurement RequirementsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.