Ethics (G2)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0048Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - Confidentiality of Activities - RepealDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0419 / CH0130Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Environment and Transportation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1330Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political ConsultingDelegate McMillanIn the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1342 / CH0525
    (SB1138)
State Government – Discrimination and HarassmentDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Rules
3/30/2018 - 12:30 p.m.
HB1469 / CH0530Ethics - Members of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control BoardsDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1788State Government – Appointments Office in the Office of the Governor – ReportingDelegate LamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
SB0474 / CH0457Ethics - Local Public Ethics Commissions and Entities - Meeting and Reporting RequirementsSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1138
    (HB1342 / CH0525)
Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual HarassmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.