Financial Institutions (I1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0498Financial Institutions - Automated Teller Machine Check Deposits - Mandatory ReviewDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1219Consumer Protection - Required Notice by Financial Institutions - Nonpublic Personal InformationDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1306Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task ForceDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1322Transportation Infrastructure BankDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1368Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1463Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Disclosure of FeesDelegate FrickIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic Matters
HJ0003Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.