Financial Institutions (I1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0704 / CH0277
    (SB0160 / CH0276)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting ExtensionDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0723 / CH0421Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - RequirementsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0735
    (SB0583 / CH0306)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsDelegate OlszewskiVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0008
    (SJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0160 / CH0276
    (HB0704 / CH0277)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting ExtensionSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 276Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0583 / CH0306
    (HB0735)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1091 / CH0579Financial Institutions - Registered Mortgage Loan Originators - Expedited LicensesSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0008
    (HJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.