Financial Institutions (I1)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0142
    (SB0033)
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and RecordsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0182 / CH0253Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0247Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0525Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - DefinitionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0568Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a SetoffDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0591Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in MarylandDelegate ConawayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0718 / CH0266
    (SB0206 / CH0265)
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - ResidencyDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0770
    (SB0916)
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan ServicersDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1134 / CH0781
    (SB0884 / CH0018)
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection CommissionDelegate FrickEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1376Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving SpouseDelegate MaloneIn the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Holmes)Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1499Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - RequirementsDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0004Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0033
    (HB0142)
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and RecordsChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
SB0206 / CH0265
    (HB0718 / CH0266)
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - ResidencySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 265Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0884 / CH0018
    (HB1134 / CH0781)
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection CommissionSenator RosapepeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0916
    (HB0770)
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan ServicersSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0924 / CH0479Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Surety Bond Requirements for Licensees and RegistrantsSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:46 A.M.