Financial Institutions (I1)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0187 / CH0479
    (SB0006)
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – ExpansionChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0791
    (SB0748)
Interception of Communication - Financial InstitutionsDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1297 / CH0790Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 790Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1642
    (SB1012)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – OmbudsmanDelegate FrickIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0006
    (HB0187 / CH0479)
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - ExpansionChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0748
    (HB0791)
Interception of Communication - Financial InstitutionsSenator AstleIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1012
    (HB1642)
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of ServicersSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.