Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0088
    (SB0199 / CH0205)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0334 / CH0295
    (SB0589 / CH0294)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase TransactionsDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295Economic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0522
    (SB0465)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB1167Consumer Protection - Credit Cards - Surcharge on Sales Transactions - ProhibitionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1195Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on RentalsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
HB1218Consumer Protection - Payment by Credit Card - Prohibition of SurchargeDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1297 / CH0330
    (SB0897 / CH0329)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0199 / CH0205
    (HB0088)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0465
    (HB0522)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
Finance
SB0589 / CH0294
    (HB0334 / CH0295)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase TransactionsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 294Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0897 / CH0329
    (HB1297 / CH0330)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.