Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0735
    (SB0583 / CH0306)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsDelegate OlszewskiVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1032Consumer Debt Collection - Statute of Limitations (Maryland Zombie Debt Act)Delegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1272Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security FreezesDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1527Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure TimelineDelegate BraveboyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0583 / CH0306
    (HB0735)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.