Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0530Credit Regulation - Motor Vehicle Sales - Assignment of Financing AgreementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0782
    (SB0665)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB0783Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - RestrictionsDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1159
    (SB0773)
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - RestrictionsSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1450 / CH0393
    (SB0471 / CH0392)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset RepealDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1451Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate VaughnIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0037Commercial Law - Security Freezes - Fees for Active Duty Military Service MembersSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0471 / CH0392
    (HB1450 / CH0393)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset RepealSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 392Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0665
    (HB0782)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0773
    (HB1159)
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - RestrictionsPresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0855Commercial Law - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow AccountsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1132Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and FeeSenator MannoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.