Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0212 / CH0827
    (SB0270 / CH0828)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesDelegate WaldstreicherEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0525Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - DefinitionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1134 / CH0781
    (SB0884 / CH0018)
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection CommissionDelegate FrickEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1166
    (SB0893)
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive ConsiderationDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1270 / CH0724
    (SB0527 / CH0723)
Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and ChargesDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 724Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1376Real Property - Mortgages - Substitution of Surviving SpouseDelegate MaloneIn the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Holmes)Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1400
    (SB1098)
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0203Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's FeeSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0270 / CH0828
    (HB0212 / CH0827)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesSenator LeeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0283Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow AccountsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0392 / CH0484Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative DisclosuresSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0527 / CH0723
    (HB1270 / CH0724)
Credit Regulation - Unsecured Open End Credit Plans - Fees and ChargesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 723Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0884 / CH0018
    (HB1134 / CH0781)
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection CommissionSenator RosapepeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0893
    (HB1166)
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive ConsiderationSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1098
    (HB1400)
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB1101Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - NoticeSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:53 A.M.